Lim, Darwin Lao (CPSO#: 88154)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Mar 2008 to 30 May 2008
PEAP - Resident - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2009