Lim, Elizabeth Seton (CPSO#: 83926)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Dec 2005 to 13 Jan 2006
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008