Lim, Gloria (CPSO#: 86214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5389
Fax: (416) 864-3055
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gloria Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lim ( CPSO# 86214 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 2-084
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 13 Jan 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLORIA LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013