Lim, Kenneth Ian (CPSO#: 61212)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1998