Lim, Ki Dong (CPSO#: 80746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Health Centre
1060 Speers Road, Suite 215
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 842-6084
Fax: (905) 842-4579
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ki Dong Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lim ( CPSO# 80746 )

Business Address:
1060 Speers Road
Suite 215
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 842-6084

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KI DONG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008