Lim, Kok Bin (CPSO#: 83596)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006