Lim, Raymond Tau (CPSO#: 82453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 400
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: 905-366-0053
Fax: 905-366-0016
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2018

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND TAU LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007