Lim, Rodrick Ka-Nung (CPSO#: 68862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital of Western
Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 8131
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lim ( CPSO# 68862 )

Business Address:
Division of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODRICK KA-NUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999