Lim, Ronald Tong Hoe (CPSO#: 58961)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Mar 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010