Lim, Siok Hoon (CPSO#: 87101)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Singapore, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R R 149
800 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1M4

Medical Records Location

Address: 555 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 30 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Research Fellows - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2015