Lim, Teddy Andrew (CPSO#: 71566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough & Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4054
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crescent Oral Surgery (Toronto)
1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 500
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-5222
Fax: (416) 752-5500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Oral Surgery (RH)
9251 Yonge Street
Suite 400
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8006
Fax: (905) 889-8866
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery (Aurora)
236 Wellington Street East
Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 713-9900
Fax: (905) 713-0135
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 1301
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-0262
Fax: (416) 926-0936
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Suite 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic (Pickering)
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic (RH)
330 Hwy #7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P1
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

GTA Endoscopy
905 Milner Avenue
Suite 920
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teddy A. Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lim ( CPSO# 71566 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEDDY ANDREW LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005