Lim, Teresa (CPSO#: 105696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301
Fax: (416) 281 7465
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lim ( CPSO# 105696)

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
2877 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7301

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 15 Dec 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Teresa Lim may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and
            adolescent psychiatry.