Lim, Wendy Pei-Wen (CPSO#: 72320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6024
Fax: (905) 540-6568
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy Lim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lim ( CPSO# 72320 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6024

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY PEI-WEN LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002