Limongelli, Fulvio Mario (CPSO#: 23298)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Genova, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1997