Lin, Alvin Curtis (CPSO#: 100940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 08 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of General Surgery
Queen Wing 3-073
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5422
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALVIN CURTIS LIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017