Lin, Cassie Wei (CPSO#: 74088)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1999 to 30 Jul 1999
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 1999 to 27 Aug 1999
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002