Lin, Cheng (CPSO#: 96015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Dept of Anes & Perioperative Med
Room C2-168
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. Page 15896
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheng Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lin ( CPSO# 96015 )

Business Address:
University of Western Ontario
Department of Anes & Perioperative Med
339 Windermere Road
Room B3 218
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHENG LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016