Lin, Dolly Menghan (CPSO#: 107514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2014
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOLLY MENGHAN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017