Lin, Edward Dat Hang (CPSO#: 56814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Kennedy Road
Suite 702
Scarborough ON  M1T 3V3
Phone: (416) 292-6509
Fax: (416) 292-0797
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7155 Woodbine Ave, Unit 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lin ( CPSO# 56814 )

Business Address:
702 - 2075 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 3V3
Phone Number: (416) 292-6509

Business Address:
125 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
601 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD DAT HANG LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1987