Lin, Frank Yung-Harn (CPSO#: 70134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive, Suite 305
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 836-6920
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK YUNG-HARN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2000