Lin, Helen (CPSO#: 107179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lin ( CPSO# 107179)

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017