Lin, Jackson Meng Kuan (CPSO#: 61195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 728-3722
Fax: (705) 728-9449
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Clinic for Person-Centred
Psychotherapy
#403
265 Yorkland Blvd.
North York ON  M2J 5C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACKSON MENG KUAN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1990