Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lin, Liping (CPSO#: 68143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
EMG Lab
9th Floor Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5193
Fax: (416) 864-6095
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI- The Doctor's Office
Royal Bank Plaza
200 Bay Street
Lower Concourse Level
Toronto ON  M5J 2J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6787
Fax: (416) 368-7632
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIPING LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999