Lin, Mary Mei-Ling (CPSO#: 61051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 255-2130
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. D. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lin ( CPSO# 61051 )
Dr. W. Callaghan ( CPSO# 59490 )

Business Address:
1096 Goyeau Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 977-5364

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lin ( CPSO# 61051 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MEI-LING LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990