Lin, Susy (CPSO#: 69219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2008

Dr. S. Lin ( CPSO# 69219 )

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SUSY LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997