Lin, Vincent Yu-Wen (CPSO#: 74892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Otolaryngology
Head & Neck Surgery M1 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7251
Fax: (416) 480-5761
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Y.W. Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lin ( CPSO# 74892 )
Dr. T. Hsieh ( CPSO# 76183 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Otolaryngology
Head & Neck Surgery M1 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT YU-WEN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005