Lin, Yi-Tsern Nancy (CPSO#: 91316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Our Lady of Fatima University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
9 EW - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5349
Fax: 416 603 5661
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hong Fook Mental Health Association
130 Dundas Street West
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416)493-4242
Fax: (416)595-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lin ( CPSO# 91316 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 9 E W
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5349

Business Address:
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
130 Dundas Street West
Suite 3F
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 493-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YI-TSERN NANCY LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015