Lince, Dario (CPSO#: 30458)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Antioquia, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 2004