Lindner, Kirsten Katherina Valeska (CPSO#: 76130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hosptial Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lindner ( CPSO# 76130 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Village of Erin Meadows
2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN KATHERINA VALESKA LINDNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003