Lindsay, Ardis Brian (CPSO#: 26766)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ardis B. Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 108, 309 Park Street, Brockville, ON K6V 6E5
Instructions: Contact Dr. Kevin Leonard for records
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015