Lindsay, David Ross (CPSO#: 66626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
Sunnyside Wing East
Suite 415
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6180
Fax: (416) 530-6181
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lindsay ( CPSO# 66626 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Wing East
Room 415 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998