Lindsay, Peter Alfred (CPSO#: 30590)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Lindsay Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Campus Department of Anaesthesia 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2016


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016