Lindsay, Shanna Louise (CPSO#: 67918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Keough, Shanna Louise (used until: 21 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Wing East
414-30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6180
Fax: (416) 530-6181
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6406
Fax: (416) 469-6584
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto
M3M 0B2
Toronto ON  M3N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNA LOUISE LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999