Lindsay, Thomas Fooks (CPSO#: 52450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Hospital - General Division
Eaton Wing 6-228
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4620
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas F Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lindsay ( CPSO# 52450 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto Hospital - General Division
Room EN6-228
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4620

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS FOOKS LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989