Lindzon, Aaron Jay (CPSO#: 69945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 488-8876
Fax: (416) 488-7777
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron J. Lindzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lindzon ( CPSO# 69945 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 488-8876

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON JAY LINDZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDZON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000