Lindzon, Ronald David (CPSO#: 32240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Mews Medical Clinic
4997 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1N1
Phone: (905) 475-3995
Fax: (905) 475-3581
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Lindzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lindzon ( CPSO# 32240 )

Business Address:
Markham Mews Medical Clinic
4997 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 475-3995

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD DAVID LINDZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDZON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983