Linehan, Patrick Thomas Paul (CPSO#: 60335)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2010