Ling, Audrey Lai-Hang (CPSO#: 72163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton University Health Services
Suite 2600
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Fax: (613) 520-3851
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUDREY LAI-HANG LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001