Ling, Brian Man Yih (CPSO#: 63931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Kingston Road West
Ajax ON  L1T 4K8
Phone: (905) 426-2501
Fax: (905) 426-4852
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Ling & Dr. K. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ling ( CPSO# 63931 )
Dr. K. Cheung ( CPSO# 65234 )

Business Address:
30 Kingston Road West
Ajax ON  L1T 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-2501

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MAN YIH LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992