Ling, Chi Meng (CPSO#: 87333)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007