Ling, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46698
Fax: (905) 577-8023
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75645
Fax: (905) 522-1393
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Lotus
199 MacNab St S
Hamilton ON  L8P 3C8
Canada
Phone: (905) 645-5640
Fax: (905) 645-5643
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

JHCC
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Fax: (905) 575-2591
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

726 Upper James Street
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Ling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ling ( CPSO# 62561 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
JHCC
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
Lotus Cosmetic Surgery Centre
199 MacNab Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3C8
Phone Number: (905) 645-5640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1991