Ling, Emily Wai-Yin (CPSO#: 45271)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010