Ling, Erick Kaming (CPSO#: 103624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto Family
Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K2R7
Canada
Phone: 4165973422 Ext. 2235
Fax: 4165884174
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERICK KAMING LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016