Ling, Franklin Chi Kin (CPSO#: 59177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2261
Fax: (519) 749-4221
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 27 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLIN CHI KIN LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992