Ling, Patrick Man Chien (CPSO#: 69634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Point 9 Building
104-311 Ludlow Street
Saskatoon SK  S7S1N6
Phone: (306) 500-0200
Fax: (306) 500-0200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK MAN CHIEN LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 1995 to 07 Nov 1995
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1996