Lingurar, Maxine Audrey (CPSO#: 61308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maxine Audrey Lingurar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arkansas
USA - Kansas
USA - Michigan
USA - Nevada
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAXINE AUDREY LINGURAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGURAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017