Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lingys, Auksuole Teresa (CPSO#: 21888)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records up to December 2012 from Dr. Lingys' family practice are stored with: RSRS Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 1-877-398-5932 info@rsrs.com Walk-in clinic records from April 2013- January 2017 are stored with: Urgent Care Centre 1500 Dundas Street East Mississauga ON L4X 1L4 urgentcentre.ca 905-212-1433
Date Received: 24 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017