Lipan, Carla Beatrice (CPSO#: 84195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: (613) 345-8316
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-8645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Canada
Phone: (613) 267-1500 Ext. 1138
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 5602
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carla Lipan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lipan ( CPSO# 84195 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
Perth & Smith Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA BEATRICE LIPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2006 to 06 Jul 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Jul 2006 to 07 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2007 to 07 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2008 to 07 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2009 to 30 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2009 to 30 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2010 to 30 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011