Lipcsei, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 60788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Centre - Cognitive Therapy
Suite 850
36 Toronto Street
Toronto ON  M5C 2C5
Phone: (416) 777-6699
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-876-5028
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter L. Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipcsei ( CPSO# 60788 )
Dr. P. Hughes ( CPSO# 61084 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6844

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE LIPCSEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPCSEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1990