Lipinski, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 27826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2L1
Phone: (416) 926-0115
Fax: (416) 972-6709
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kenneth Lipinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipinski ( CPSO# 27826 )

Business Address:
216 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 926-0115

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH LIPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1980